WI AB780 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 939.24 (3); and to amend 939.42 (intro.), 939.42 (1) and 939.42 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: eliminating voluntary intoxication as a defense to criminal liability. (FE)
Title
Eliminating voluntary intoxication as a defense to criminal liability. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Tyler August [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] |
Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 307 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-4-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-03-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-27 | House | Representative Craig added as a coauthor |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Introduced |