WI AB695 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 100.45 (5) (a) 2., 100.45 (5) (c) and 100.45 (5m); and to amend 20.115 (1) (hm), 100.45 (3) (b) 2., 100.45 (3) (c) 4., 100.45 (4) (d) and 100.45 (4) (h) of the statutes; Relating to: the regulation of motor vehicle air conditioners. (FE)
Title
The regulation of motor vehicle air conditioners. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 312 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 30, Noes 3 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 4, Noes 1 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2014-01-31 | House | Introduced |