WI AB637 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 97.01 (2), 97.01 (7), 97.02 (1) to (14), 97.03 (1) (a) to (n), (2) and (3), 97.46, 97.47, 97.48, 97.50, 97.52 and 97.53; to renumber and amend 97.02 (intro.) and 97.03 (1) (intro.); and to amend 97.18 (1) (a), 97.22 (10), 97.23 (2) (a), 100.057 and 100.36 of the statutes; Relating to: adulterated, misbranded, and insanitary food.
Title
Adulterated, misbranded, and insanitary food.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Weatherston [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] |
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 374 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced |