WI AB613 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 59.23 (2) (j) and 59.23 (2) (k); to renumber 59.23 (2) (d); to amend 5.62 (4) (b), 7.20 (1), 7.21 (2), 59.23 (1) (a), 59.23 (1) (b), 59.23 (1) (c), 59.23 (2) (a), 59.23 (2) (b), 59.23 (2) (c), 59.23 (2) (d) (title), 59.23 (2) (e), 59.23 (2) (f), 59.23 (2) (h), 59.23 (2) (m) 2., 59.23 (2) (n), 59.23 (2) (q), 59.23 (2) (r), 59.23 (2) (s) and 889.04; and to create 59.23 (2) (cm), 59.23 (2) (d) 2., 59.23 (2) (de), 59.23 (2) (dg), 59.23 (2) (di), 59.23 (2) (i) and 59.23 (2) (nm) of the statutes; Relating to: modifying the duties of a county clerk; the counties in which a board of election commissioners is required; and staffing of a board of election commissioners in populous counties. (FE)
Title
Modifying the duties of a county clerk; the counties in which a board of election commissioners is required; and staffing of a board of election commissioners in populous counties. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 373 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-03-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2014-03-11 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2014-03-06 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bernier |
2014-02-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bernier |
2014-02-12 | House | LRB correction |
2014-02-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-29 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs and Government Operations |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced |