WI AB612 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 972.15 (4); and to create 950.04 (1v) (pd) and 972.15 (4r) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing a victim of a crime to view portions of a presentence investigation report.
Title
Allowing a victim of a crime to view portions of a presentence investigation report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 338 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-3-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2014-02-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-02-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goyke |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-09 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced |