WI AB596 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 196.378 (3) (a) 1m., 196.49 (1) (am), 196.50 (1) (a) and 196.81 (3) (b); and to create 196.50 (1) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: renewable resource credits, removal of certain natural gas service laterals, natural gas public utility service in municipalities, and granting rule-making authority.
Title
Renewable resource credits, removal of certain natural gas service laterals, natural gas public utility service in municipalities, and granting rule-making authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 300 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-02-25 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-25-2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-11-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-01-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-01-21 | House | Representatives Wright, Bewley and Zepnick added as coauthors |
2014-01-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-01-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-01-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-21 | House | Read a second time |
2014-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 10, Noes 0 |
2014-01-15 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-09 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-01-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities |
2014-01-03 | House | Introduced |