WI AB49 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: increasing the funding for grants to provide skills enhancement services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Increasing the funding for grants to provide skills enhancement services and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-05 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Workforce Development and take up (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2014-02-04 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2013-11-05 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Workforce Development and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 56 |
2013-03-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2013-03-01 | House | Introduced |