WI AB45 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 16.754 (2); to amend 16.754 (3) (intro.) and (a) and 66.0901 (1m) (b); and to create 16.754 (2) (b) and 66.0901 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: preference in state and local government contracts and procurement for materials manufactured in the United States. (FE)
Title
Preference in state and local government contracts and procurement for materials manufactured in the United States. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-05 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-29 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2013-11-05 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on State Affairs and Government Operations and take up, Ayes 39, Noes 56 |
2013-10-17 | House | Withdrawn from committee on Government Operations and State Licensing and referred to committee on State Affairs and Government Operations pursuant to Assembly Resolution 19 |
2013-03-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing |
2013-02-26 | House | Introduced |