WI AB415 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-6)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.0413 (1) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: changing the method by which a municipality may collect the costs of razing a building from a property owner. (FE)
Title
Changing the method by which a municipality may collect the costs of razing a building from a property owner. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-11-12 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-13 | House | Published 12-14-2013 |
2013-12-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 87 |
2013-12-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-12-2013 |
2013-11-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-21-2013 |
2013-11-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 33, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-11-05 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-05 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-05 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-31 | House | Placed on calendar 11-5-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-10-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-28 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 7, Noes 1 |
2013-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2013-10-04 | House | Introduced |