WI AB406 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 941.318, 961.14 (4) (te), (th), (tL), (tp), (tr), (tu) and (ty) and 961.14 (7) (m) and (n); to amend 59.54 (25g), 66.0107 (1) (bn), 961.14 (4) (intro.), 961.14 (7) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1) (hm) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (e) (intro.), 961.41 (1m) (hm) (intro.), 961.41 (1r), 961.41 (3g) (d) and 961.41 (3g) (em); to repeal and recreate 961.14 (4) (tb) and 961.14 (7) (L); and to create 961.14 (4) (sm), 961.14 (4) (uv), 961.14 (4) (wa), 961.14 (4) (wb), 961.14 (4) (wk), 961.14 (4) (wL), 961.14 (4) (wm), 961.14 (4) (wn), 961.14 (4) (wo), 961.14 (4) (wp), 961.14 (4) (wq), 961.14 (4) (wr), 961.14 (4) (ws), 961.14 (4) (wv), 961.14 (4) (ww), 961.14 (4) (wx), 961.14 (4) (wy), 961.14 (4) (wz), 961.14 (4) (xa), 961.14 (4) (xb), 961.14 (7) (mk), 961.14 (7) (mL), 961.14 (7) (mm), 961.14 (7) (mn), 961.16 (3) (tb), 961.16 (3) (zt), 961.16 (8) (b), 961.18 (7) (am), 961.18 (7) (az), 961.18 (7) (em), 961.20 (2) (ax), 961.20 (2) (q), 961.20 (4) (d), 961.22 (4), 961.22 (5), 961.41 (1) (em) and 961.41 (1m) (em) of the statutes; Relating to: controlled substances, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Controlled substances, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] |
Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
Rep. Evan Goyke [D] | Sen. Andre Jacque [R] | Rep. Dean Knudson [R] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] |
Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Paul Tittl [R] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] | Rep. Penny Schaber [D] |
Sen. Sheila Harsdorf [R] | Sen. Bob Jauch [D] | Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] |
Sen. Julie Lassa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Representative Smith added as a coauthor |
2013-10-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-10 | House | Representative Knudson withdrawn as a coauthor |
2013-10-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice |
2013-10-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab406 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB406.pdf |