WI AB387 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-18)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-18)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 48.02 (1d), 48.02 (2), 48.366 (8), subchapter IX (title) of chapter 48 [precedes 48.44], 48.44 (title), 48.44 (1), 48.45 (1) (a), 48.45 (1) (am), 48.45 (3), 118.163 (4), 125.07 (4) (d), 125.07 (4) (e) 1., 125.085 (3) (bt), 165.83 (1) (c) 1., 165.83 (1) (c) 2., 301.12 (2m), 301.12 (14) (a), 301.26 (4) (cm) 2., 302.31 (7), 938.02 (1), 938.02 (10m), 938.12 (2), 938.18 (2), 938.183 (3), 938.255 (1) (intro.), 938.34 (8), 938.343 (2), 938.344 (3), 938.35 (1m), 938.355 (4) (b), 938.355 (4m) (a), 938.39, subchapter IX (title) of chapter 938 [precedes 938.44], 938.44, 938.45 (1) (a), 938.45 (3), 938.48 (4m) (title), 938.48 (4m) (a), 938.48 (4m) (b), 938.48 (14), 938.57 (3) (title), 938.57 (3) (a) (intro.), 938.57 (3) (a) 1., 938.57 (3) (a) 3., 938.57 (3) (b), 939.632 (1) (e) 1., 939.632 (1) (e) 3., 946.50 (intro.), 948.01 (1), 948.11 (2) (am) (intro.), 948.45 (1), 948.60 (2) (d), 948.61 (4), 961.455 (title), 961.455 (1), 961.455 (2), 961.46, 961.573 (2), 961.574 (2), 961.575 (1), 961.575 (2), 961.575 (3), 990.01 (3) and 990.01 (20) of the statutes; Relating to: the age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who is not alleged to have committed certain violent offences or has not previously been convicted of a crime or adjudicated delinquent is subject to juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Title
The age at which a person who is alleged to have violated a criminal law, a civil law, or a municipal ordinance and who is not alleged to have committed certain violent offences or has not previously been convicted of a crime or adjudicated delinquent is subject to juvenile court jurisdiction. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-01-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-11-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-10-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2013-09-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab387 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB387.pdf |