WI AB376 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 289.41 (6) (a); and to create 289.41 (6) (m) of the statutes; Relating to: the net worth method of providing proof of financial responsibility for certain solid waste facilities.
Title
The net worth method of providing proof of financial responsibility for certain solid waste facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
Sen. Jeff Smith [D] | Rep. Fred Clark [D] | Rep. Dana Wachs [D] | Rep. Brett Hulsey [D] |
Sen. Bob Jauch [D] | Sen. Jennifer Shilling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 281 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-07 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-7-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Environment and Forestry, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2013-11-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment and Forestry |
2013-09-17 | House | Introduced |