WI AB33 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 302.372 (6) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: extending the time period for counties to seek reimbursement from prisoners for expenses associated with confinement in jail. (FE)
Title
Extending the time period for counties to seek reimbursement from prisoners for expenses associated with confinement in jail. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Endsley [R] | Rep. Steve Kestell [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] | Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Jeff Stone [R] |
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Daniel LeMahieu [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] | Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] | Sen. Richard Gudex [R] |
Sen. Dale Schultz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 315 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-31 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-31-2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-20 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2014-03-18 | House | Made a special order of business at 10:02 AM on 3-20-2014 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 |
2014-03-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate Amendment 1 adopted) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 withdrawn and returned to author |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 2 offered by Senator Erpenbach |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Leibham |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Labor |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-10 | House | Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-05-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-05-31 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2013-05-31 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Corrections, Ayes 5, Noes 2 |
2013-05-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-05-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Endsley |
2013-04-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-02-20 | House | Representative Jacque added as a coauthor |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Corrections |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced |