WI AB291 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 440.62 (3) (ag) 2., 440.62 (3) (ar) 2., 454.20 (2), 454.23 (2) (d) and 454.26 (2); and to create 454.01 (7m) (am) of the statutes; Relating to: requirements concerning barbering and cosmetology licensure. (FE)
Title
Requirements concerning barbering and cosmetology licensure. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Scott Krug [R] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
Rep. Mark Honadel [R] | Rep. Sondy Pope [D] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Sen. David Craig [R] |
Rep. Steve Doyle [D] | Sen. Glenn Grothman [R] | Sen. Lena Taylor [D] | Sen. Neal Kedzie [R] |
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-10-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-10-10 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-10-10 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-10-09 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-10-07 | House | Representative Knudson added as a coauthor |
2013-10-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-10-03 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2013-09-05 | House | Representative Weininger added as a coauthor |
2013-09-05 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Government Operations and State Licensing |
2013-08-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab291 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB291.pdf |