WI AB226 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 38.41 (2) of the statutes; Relating to: grants to technical college district boards under the Workforce Advancement Training Program. (FE)
Title
Grants to technical college district boards under the Workforce Advancement Training Program. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 328 |
2014-04-17 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-04 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-4-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator L. Taylor added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Lassa added as a cosponsor |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-06-12 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-06-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-06-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-06-12 | House | Read a second time |
2013-06-10 | House | Placed on calendar 6-12-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-06-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-06-06 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2013-06-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-06-04 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-06-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2013-05-31 | House | Introduced |