WI AB208 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 341.14 (6r) (f) 62. of the statutes; Relating to: special registration plates expressing support for the family members of law enforcement officers who have died in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Special registration plates expressing support for the family members of law enforcement officers who have died in the line of duty and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 275 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 3-26-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 32, Noes 0 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-12-10 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | A. Ott, August, Ballweg, Barca, Barnes, Berceau, Bernard Schaber, Bewley, Bies, Billings, Born, Brooks, C. Taylor, Clark, Craig, Czaja, Doyle, Genrich, Goyke, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Hutton, J. Ott, Jacque, Jagler, Johnson, Jorgensen, Kapenga, Kerkman, Kessler, Kestell, Klenke, Knodl, Knudson, Kolste, Kooyenga, Kramer, Krug, Kuglitsch, LeMahieu, Loudenbeck, Marklein, Mason, Milroy, Murphy, Mursau, Murtha, Nass, Nerison, Neylon, Nygren, Pasch, Petersen, Petryk, Pope, Pridemore, Richards, Riemer, Ringhand, Ripp, Sanfelippo, Sargent, Schraa, Severson, Shankland, Sinicki, Smith, Spiros, Steineke, Strachota, Stroebel, Swearingen, T. Larson, Tauchen, Thiesfeldt, Tittl, Tranel, Vos, Vruwink, Wachs, Weatherston, Weininger, Williams, Wright, Young, Zamarripa and Zepnick of the Assembly added as coauthors |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 0 |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ripp |
2013-06-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-05-17 | House | Introduced |