WI AB191 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-12-13 - Published 12-14-2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.45 (3) (a), 943.46 (4) (a) and 943.48 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: theft of communication and video services, civil damages resulting from the theft of certain services, and providing penalties. (FE)
Title
Theft of communication and video services, civil damages resulting from the theft of certain services, and providing penalties. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Joel Kleefisch [R] | Rep. Warren Petryk [R] | Rep. Keith Ripp [R] | Sen. Paul Farrow [R] |
Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Joe Leibham [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-13 | House | Published 12-14-2013 |
2013-12-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-13-2013. 2013 Wisconsin Act 89 |
2013-12-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-12-2013 |
2013-11-21 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-21-2013 |
2013-11-12 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-12 | Senate | Read a second time |
2013-11-11 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-12-2013 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-11-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2013-10-29 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Government Operations, Public Works, and Telecommunications |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-10 | House | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-09-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 6, Noes 1 |
2013-09-17 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2013-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-09-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goyke |
2013-09-11 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2013-06-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-06-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-06-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-03 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice |
2013-05-03 | House | Introduced |