WI AB173 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Published 4-17-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 341.14 (6r) (b) 1., 341.14 (6r) (c) and 341.14 (6r) (fm) 7.; and to create 20.395 (5) (ei), 25.40 (1) (a) 30., 341.14 (6r) (b) 15., 341.14 (6r) (f) 62. and 341.14 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: special distinguishing registration plates associated with Wisconsin Trout Unlimited and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Special distinguishing registration plates associated with Wisconsin Trout Unlimited and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-14 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 53 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | House | Published 4-17-2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 266 |
2014-04-15 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-15-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-8-2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | LRB correction |
2014-04-02 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 26, Noes 7 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Placed on calendar 4-1-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-11-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2013-11-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 92, Noes 0 |
2013-11-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-11-14 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 53, Noes 39 |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2013-11-14 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Ripp and Bernard Schaber |
2013-11-14 | House | Read a second time |
2013-11-12 | House | Placed on calendar 11-14-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 6, Noes 5 |
2013-11-12 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-08 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Bernard Schaber, Kolste and Danou |
2013-09-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative J. Ott |
2013-09-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-05-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-05-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-04-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-04-25 | House | Introduced |