WI AB124 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.89 (1), 346.89 (2) and 346.95 (1); and to create 346.89 (5) and 346.89 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: inattentive driving and providing a penalty.
Title
Inattentive driving and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] |
Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Rep. Tom Larson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R] | Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] |
Rep. Alvin Ott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 350 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 4-2-2014 |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar 3-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Public Safety, and Veterans and Military Affairs |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 adopted |
2014-02-13 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on calendar 2-13-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-24 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Bies |
2014-01-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2013-04-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-04-04 | House | Introduced |