WI AB107 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Published 4-24-2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.80 (15) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: an entertainer's surety bond. (FE)
Title
An entertainer's surety bond. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Garey Bies [R] | Rep. Terese Berceau [D] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] |
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D] | Rep. John Spiros [R] | Rep. Patricia Strachota [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | House | Published 4-24-2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-23-2014. 2013 Wisconsin Act 349 |
2014-04-22 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-22-2014 |
2014-02-28 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-28-2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 2-18-2014 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2013-10-22 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Energy, Consumer Protection, and Government Reform |
2013-10-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2013-10-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-10-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-10-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2013-10-15 | House | Read a second time |
2013-10-10 | House | Placed on calendar 10-15-2013 by Committee on Rules |
2013-09-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-09-05 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-09-05 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2013-08-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-08-13 | House | Representative Wright added as a coauthor |
2013-08-06 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-07-22 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Bies |
2013-03-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-03-26 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection |
2013-03-26 | House | Introduced |