WA SB6653 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a property tax exemption for property owned by a nonprofit organization and used for the purpose of a farmers market.
Title
Concerning a property tax exemption for property owned by a nonprofit organization and used for the purpose of a farmers market.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Jacobsen [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-02 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-02 | ARED - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2010-01-20 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2402 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6653&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6653.pdf |