WA SB5017 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining honey bee products and services as an agricultural product.
Title
Defining honey bee products and services as an agricultural product.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | AWRD - Majority; do pass. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development. |
2014-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5017&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5017.pdf |