WA HB2753 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Imposing motor vehicle fuel taxes on compressed natural and liquefied natural gas used for transportation purposes.
Title
Imposing motor vehicle fuel taxes on compressed natural and liquefied natural gas used for transportation purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB6440 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-03 - Effective date 7/1/2015.