WA HB2639 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state purchasing of mental health and chemical dependency treatment services.
Title
Concerning state purchasing of mental health and chemical dependency treatment services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 31; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB6312 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-04 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.