WA HB2580 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Fostering economic resilience and development in Washington by supporting the maritime industry and other manufacturing sectors.
Title
Fostering economic resilience and development in Washington by supporting the maritime industry and other manufacturing sectors.
Sponsors
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 127, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TRED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Amendment ruled beyond the scope and object of the bill. |
2014-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-13 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPG - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology. |
2014-02-04 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |