WA HB2462 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Giving preferences to housing trust fund projects that involve collaboration between local school districts and housing authorities to help children of low-income families succeed in school.
Title
Giving preferences to housing trust fund projects that involve collaboration between local school districts and housing authorities to help children of low-income families succeed in school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-13 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | CB - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2014-01-28 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-28 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB6338 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2462&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2462.pdf |