WA HB2433 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a city or town to notify light and power businesses and gas distribution businesses of annexed areas and affected properties.
Title
Requiring a city or town to notify light and power businesses and gas distribution businesses of annexed areas and affected properties.
Sponsors
Sen. Cyrus Habib [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 123, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |