WA HB2402 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on March 24 2010 - 100% progress
Action: 2010-03-24 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning a property tax exemption for property owned by a nonprofit organization and used for the purpose of a farmers market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning a property tax exemption for property owned by a nonprofit organization and used for the purpose of a farmers market.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-24 Effective date 6/10/2010.
2010-03-24 Chapter 186, 2010 Laws.
2010-03-24 Governor signed.
2010-03-11 Delivered to Governor.
2010-03-10 President signed.
2010-03-10 Speaker signed.
2010-03-06 Passed final passage; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2010-03-06 House concurred in Senate amendments.
2010-03-03 Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2010-03-03 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-03-03 Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
2010-03-02 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-03-01 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-03-01 WM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2010-03-01 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
2010-03-01 Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2010-02-27 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2010-02-26 Referred to Ways & Means.
2010-02-26 And refer to Ways & Means.
2010-02-26 ARED - Majority; do pass with amendment
2010-02-25 Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 3:30 PM.
2010-02-22 Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM.
2010-02-15 First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development.
2010-02-12 Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2010-02-12 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2010-02-12 1st substitute bill substituted
2010-02-11 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2010-02-09 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2010-02-09 FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2010-02-09 FIN - Executive action taken by committee.
2010-02-09 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2010-01-15 Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM.
2010-01-11 First reading, referred to Finance.
2010-12-07 Prefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6653 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback