WA HB2377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving quality in the early care and education system.
Title
Improving quality in the early care and education system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 64; nays, 33; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6127 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.