WA HB2373 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting provisions to improve educational outcomes for homeless students.
Title
Enacting provisions to improve educational outcomes for homeless students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | APPE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-02-07 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-02-07 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 12:00 PM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB6074 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.