WA HB2335 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 3/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 3/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning extended foster care services.
Title
Concerning extended foster care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 3/1/2015. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 122, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 86; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 7:30 PM. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2014-03-05 | House | Held on second reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-03-05 | House | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments and floor amendment |
2014-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-02-10 | House | Public hearing, executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-29 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-01-29 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6101 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-11 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.