WA HB2329 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the breastfeeding-friendly Washington designation.
Title
Creating the breastfeeding-friendly Washington designation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 85; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 6:00 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |