WA HB2167 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the date by which challenged schools are identified.
Title
Changing the date by which challenged schools are identified.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Cathy Dahlquist [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-02 | House | Chapter 191, 2014 Laws PV. |
2014-04-02 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |