WA HB2166 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for educational data on students from military families.
Title
Providing for educational data on students from military families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-01-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-29 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-29 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |