WA HB2148 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning health plan coverage for the voluntary termination of a pregnancy.
Title
Concerning health plan coverage for the voluntary termination of a pregnancy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
2014-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6359 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-22 - First reading, referred to Health Care.