WA HB1966 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting transit agencies that manufacture liquid natural gas or compressed natural gas for the purposes of providing public transportation from the definition of manufacturing in respect to business and occupation tax.
Title
Exempting transit agencies that manufacture liquid natural gas or compressed natural gas for the purposes of providing public transportation from the definition of manufacturing in respect to business and occupation tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Jessyn Farrell [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-26 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-02-12 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |