WA HB1840 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning firearms laws for persons subject to no-contact orders, protection orders, and restraining orders.
Title
Concerning firearms laws for persons subject to no-contact orders, protection orders, and restraining orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014*. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 111, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:30 PM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2013-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |