WA HB1732 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government and Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Regarding campaign finance disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding campaign finance disclosure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-12 Referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs.
2012-01-12 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-03-07 Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2011-02-22 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-02-17 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-02-16 Minority; do not pass.
2011-02-16 SGTA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-02-16 SGTA - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-16 Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2011-02-09 Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM.
2011-02-01 First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback