WA HB1727 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Raising licensure limits to allow assisted living facilities to serve a higher acuity resident population.
Title
Raising licensure limits to allow assisted living facilities to serve a higher acuity resident population.
Sponsors
Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-02-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-03 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-03 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:45 PM. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 37; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-28 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |