WA HB1724 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning statements made by juveniles during assessments or screenings for mental health or chemical dependency treatment.
Title
Concerning statements made by juveniles during assessments or screenings for mental health or chemical dependency treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-28 | House | Chapter 110, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-28 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-21 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |