WA HB1709 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a study to develop a state foreign language education interpreter training program.
Title
Requiring a study to develop a state foreign language education interpreter training program.
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy Dahlquist [R] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Marcie Maxwell [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-31 | House | Chapter 150, 2014 Laws PV. |
2014-03-31 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 81; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2014-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-18 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education. |
2014-01-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-22 | House | ED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |