WA HB1632 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 5 2011 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying cost of supervision provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying cost of supervision provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-02 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-12 Referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness.
2012-01-12 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-05-25 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2011-05-03 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2011-05-02 Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2011-04-29 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-22 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2011-04-07 First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2011-04-05 Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2011-04-05 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-04-05 1st substitute bill substituted
2011-04-05 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2011-03-07 Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2011-02-26 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2011-02-25 Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2011-02-24 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-02-23 APPG - Majority; do pass PSEP 11 bill proposed by Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness.
2011-02-21 APPG - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-21 Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-18 Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-17 Referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight.
2011-02-16 PSEP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-02-16 PSEP - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-16 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-09 Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-27 First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback