WA HB1555 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the education of surgical technologists.
Title
Concerning the education of surgical technologists.
Sponsors
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-22 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-22 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |