WA HB1339 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the scope of practice for East Asian medicine practitioners and removing certain referral requirements.
Title
Clarifying the scope of practice for East Asian medicine practitioners and removing certain referral requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] | Rep. Paul Harris [R] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2014-02-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2013-02-25 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 6. |
2013-02-25 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-08 | House | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |