WA HB1336 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 26 2011 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing the use of federal census data to determine the resident population of annexed territory.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing the use of federal census data to determine the resident population of annexed territory.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-02-26 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-12 Referred to Local Government.
2012-01-12 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-22 By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2011-03-01 First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2011-02-26 Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2011-02-26 Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2011-02-26 1st substitute bill substituted
2011-02-24 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2011-02-22 Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2011-02-16 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-02-15 LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-02-15 LG - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-15 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2011-01-26 Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
2011-01-19 First reading, referred to Local Government.

Same As/Similar To

SB5505 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-12 - Effective date 5/12/2011.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback