WA HB1294 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning flame retardants.
Title
Concerning flame retardants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-22 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2014-01-22 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 25; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-01-20 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-28 | Senate | Returned to House Rules 3. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference committee appointed. Representatives Short, Upthegrove, Van De Wege. |
2013-04-22 | House | House refuses to concur in the Senate amendments. Asks Senate for Conference thereon. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2013-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 44; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-23 | House | APPG - Majority; do pass ENVI 13 bill proposed by Environment. |
2013-02-23 | House | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-23 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | House | ENVI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5181 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.