WA HB1289 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Making changes to juvenile court jurisdiction over offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making changes to juvenile court jurisdiction over offenders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-02-14 Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
2012-01-26 Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-03-07 Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
2011-03-03 Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2011-02-25 Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2011-02-21 Minority; do not pass.
2011-02-21 APPH - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-02-21 APPH - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-21 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-18 Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-16 Referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations & Oversight.
2011-02-16 Committee relieved of further consideration.
2011-02-11 Referred to General Government Appropriations & Oversight.
2011-02-08 Minority; do not pass.
2011-02-08 ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2011-02-08 ELHS - Executive action taken by committee.
2011-02-08 Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM.
2011-02-03 Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 9:00 AM.
2011-01-18 First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback