WA HB1283 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Changing compulsory school attendance requirements for children six and seven years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing compulsory school attendance requirements for children six and seven years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-08 - House vote on Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 74 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13HouseReferred to Education.
2014-01-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2014-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-11-07HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2013-03-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2013-03-12SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2013-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-03-08HouseVote on third reading will be reconsidered.
2013-03-08HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 75; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-03-08HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-08House1st substitute bill substituted
2013-03-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2013-03-01HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-25HouseAPPE - Majority; do pass ED 13 bill proposed by Education.
2013-02-25HouseAPPE - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-25HousePublic hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2013-02-18HouseReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education.
2013-02-14HouseED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2013-02-14HouseED - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-14HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-08HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-31HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback