WA HB1279 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on March 7 2013 - 50% progress, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing motor voter preregistration for sixteen and seventeen year olds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing motor voter preregistration for sixteen and seventeen year olds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-01-27 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-13SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2014-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
2014-01-28SenateFirst reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
2014-01-27HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2014-01-27HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2014-01-27HouseFloor amendment
2014-01-27House1st substitute bill substituted
2014-01-24HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2014-01-23HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2014-01-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2014-01-21HouseGOE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2014-01-21HouseGOE - Executive action taken by committee.
2014-01-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
2014-01-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 10:00 AM.
2014-01-13HouseReferred to Government Operations & Elections.
2014-01-13HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2014-01-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-11-07HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-05-13HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2013-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2013-03-26SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
2013-03-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
2013-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2013-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2013-03-07HouseFloor amendment
2013-03-01HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2013-02-14HousePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2013-02-12HouseMinority; do not pass.
2013-02-12HouseGOE - Majority; do pass.
2013-02-12HouseGOE - Executive action taken by committee.
2013-02-12HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 8:00 AM.
2013-02-06HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2013-01-22HouseFirst reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections.

Same As/Similar To

SB5270 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback