WA HB1271 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progress, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting the use of fertilizer containing phosphorus.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting the use of fertilizer containing phosphorus.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-04-04 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2012-01-09 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-11-28 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-04-26 By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2011-01-18 First reading, referred to Environment.

Same As/Similar To

SB5194 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback